03/08/2023
LSM creates new head of private equity role
She will report to LSM head of business development and market relationships Mark Stephenson and Liberty Mutual global private equity and mergers & acquisitions leader Amy Gross.
03/08/2023
She will report to LSM head of business development and market relationships Mark Stephenson and Liberty Mutual global private equity and mergers & acquisitions leader Amy Gross.
03/08/2023
Gianluca Biggi will be the new Co-CEO and Brian Mattmann will join the strategic committee of the FINMA-licensed manager for collective assets as an independent member of the Board of Directors.
03/08/2023
Arlene Schuchard Steffen was catering to clients in Mexico.
03/08/2023
Looking ahead, she will work from L.E.K.’s London office to help clients with commercial due diligence, business planning, brand positioning, proposition development and new market entry services.
03/07/2023
Rob Lambert is based in the firm’s Lymington office
03/07/2023
REVEALED: Ben Palmer, head of responsible investment at Brooks Macdonald, has joined LGT Wealth Management, Citywire Wealth Manager can reveal.
03/07/2023
J.P. Morgan Asset Management is appointing Claude Kurzo as Country Head for its UK business, the investment house said in a statement Tuesday.
03/07/2023
Chameleon Asset Management has also added an independent member to its board of directors.
03/07/2023
Mathieu Saint-Cyr has joined Swiss-based Tameo, which guides investment funds and their managers on impact investing topics.
03/07/2023
Seamus Hand, Managing Partner of KPMG in Ireland said: “We’re delighted to welcome Wes to KPMG."
03/07/2023
As Kantar repositions itself as a marketing data and analytics company, Simon Bailey’s arrival will boost its offering to key clients around the world.
03/06/2023
The Secretary of State for Northern Ireland, the Right Honourable Chris Heaton-Harris MP, has announced the appointment of Fiona Ross as a Non-Executive Board Member at the Northern Ireland Office.
03/03/2023
Both Tim and Mark have significant experience in the wealth management sector, with careers spanning 33 and 24 years respectively.
03/03/2023
Titheridge is based in the firm’s Reading office, and joins a growing tax partner team in Grant Thornton’s Thames Valley and Southampton region.
03/03/2023
He takes over from the firm’s Founder, Vax Bahram, who has led the firm for more than a decade.
03/03/2023
One of only two people at N26 with regulatory clearance to run a bank in Germany, Grosse spearheaded its efforts to appease Germany's financial regulator BaFin.
03/03/2023
It consists of Kilian Schärli , Samuel Ljubicic and Serge Calame.
03/03/2023
In the last three years, Andreas Schafer has strengthened the synergies between the corporate and investment customer business in his department and successfully expanded the positioning in the core business areas.
03/03/2023
The board of directors now consists of nine members.
03/03/2023
Managers Jack Flaherty, Casey Goldmann and Mark Pearce have left the company, while Swiss-based Christof Stegmann has retired.